EP4362636 - DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Yoomin Yongin-si / KR | 02 /
PARK, Juchan Yongin-si / KR | 03 /
HONG, Sungjin Yongin-si / KR | 04 /
KIM, Sunho Yongin-si / KR | 05 /
KIM, Hyewon Yongin-si / KR | 06 /
LEE, Pilsuk Yongin-si / KR | 07 /
CHOI, Chung Sock Yongin-si / KR | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23204928.8 | 20.10.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | KR20220137499 | 24.10.2022 Original published format: KR 20220137499 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4362636 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/122, H10K59/123, H10K59/80 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H10K59/122 (EP,US);
H10K50/80 (KR);
H10K59/1213 (KR);
H10K59/123 (EP);
H10K59/131 (KR,US);
H10K59/8052 (EP);
H10K59/8723 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL | [2024/18] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL | [2024/18] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE | [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2019207150 (KWON HOIYONG [KR], et al); | [XY]US2021351248 (LEE CHUNG HOON [KR], et al); | [XY]US2022208943 (AOKI HAYATA [JP], et al) |