EP4361471 - GEARBOX LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, Maryland 20817 / US | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mullen, Michael F. Cheshire, CT, 06410 / US | 02 /
Tully, Thomas L. Box Elder, SD, 57719 / US | 03 /
Wolcott, William Burleson, TX, 76028 / US | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23205468.4 | 24.10.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | US202217973134 | 25.10.2022 Original published format: US202217973134 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361471 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04, B64C27/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
F16H57/0435 (EP,US);
B64C27/006 (EP);
F16H57/0415 (US);
F16H57/042 (US);
F16H57/0442 (EP);
F16H57/045 (EP,US);
F16H57/0417 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBESCHMIERSYSTEM FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG | [2024/18] | English: | GEARBOX LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT | [2024/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LUBRIFICATION DE BOÎTE DE VITESSES POUR AÉRONEF | [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3299673 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US]); | [XA]US10190672 (EHINGER RYAN T [US]) | by applicant | US10746284 |