EP4303376 - INSPECTION OPENING AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rug Semin GmbH Pittlerstrasse 21 63225 Langen / DE | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFER, Marion 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 23205517.8 | 29.06.2022 | [2024/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4303376 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4303376 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E04F19/08, E04B9/00 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
E04F19/08 (EP);
E04B9/003 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/02] | E04B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REVISIONSKLAPPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER REVISIONSKLAPPE | [2024/02] | English: | INSPECTION OPENING AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAME | [2024/02] | French: | TRAPPE DE RÉVISION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TRAPPE DE RÉVISION | [2024/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP22181916.2 / EP4299854 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19746725 (SCHAFFER WERNER [AT], et al) [Y] 1-14 * figures 1-2; claims 17,22 * * column 2, line 38 - line 42 * * column 5, line 38 - line 58 * * column 6, line 12 - line 13 *; | [YD]EP1387020 (RIEGELHOF & GAERTNER OHG [DE]) [YD] 1-14 * figures 1-3; claim 2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] *; | [Y]DE202009007676U (KNAUF ALUTOP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5,6,13 * figures 1-4 ** paragraph [0032] * | by applicant | EP1387020 |