EP4366382 - APPARATUS, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARABULUT, Umur 81379 Munich / DE | 02 /
AWADA, Ahmad 81249 Munich / DE | 03 /
SPAPIS, Panagiotis 81475 Munich / DE | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 23205577.2 | 24.10.2023 | [2024/19] | Priority number, date | FI20220005987 | 03.11.2022 Original published format: FI 20225987 | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4366382 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4366382 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/08, H04W36/00, // H04W92/12 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H04W36/087 (EP);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W36/0094 (EP);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W92/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2024/19] | English: | APPARATUS, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2024/19] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2024/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2022151077 (APPLE INC [US]); | [A]WO2022151208 (APPLE INC [US]); |