EP4374989 - GAS DELIVERY SYSTEM OF AN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAISWAL, Shashwat Swami Schenectady, 12345 / US | 02 /
PAL, Subrata Schenectady, 12345 / US | 03 /
DE, Anindya Kanti Schenectady, 12345 / US | 04 /
SHIBIYA, Cassidy C. Schenectady, 12345 / US | 05 /
BROMBERG, Vadim Schenectady, 12345 / US | 06 /
WHITE, Jack Bernard Schenectady, 12345 / US | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 23205773.7 | 25.10.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | IN202211065930 | 17.11.2022 Original published format: IN202211065930 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4374989 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/14, B22F10/322, B22F12/70, B29C64/165, B29C64/371, B33Y30/00, G06F30/28 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B22F12/70 (EP,US);
B22F10/14 (EP);
B22F10/322 (EP);
B29C64/153 (EP);
B29C64/165 (EP);
B29C64/371 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASABGABESYSTEM EINER MASCHINE ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2024/22] | English: | GAS DELIVERY SYSTEM OF AN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING MACHINE | [2024/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE GAZ D'UNE MACHINE DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2019090377 (AMPRO INNOVATIONS PTY LTD [AU]); | [Y]US2020078864 (MEHL SEBASTIAN [DE]); | [Y]US2020361035 (KÄSS MORITZ [DE], et al); |