EP4362351 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COMPENSATING DOPPLER SHIFT IN NON-TERRISTRIAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thinkware Corporation 9FL., A dong, Samwhan Hipex 240 Pangyoyeok-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Jeongkyu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Daewon Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
HAN, Taekyu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | BCKIP Part mbB Siegfriedstraße 8 80803 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23206160.6 | 26.10.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | KR20220140764 | 27.10.2022 Original published format: KR 20220140764 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4362351 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H04W56/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H04B7/18517 (EP);
H04B7/1855 (KR);
H04B7/18513 (CN,US);
H04B7/18519 (EP);
H04L27/2657 (KR);
H04W56/0035 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/41] |
Former [2024/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION VON DOPPLERVERSCHIEBUNGEN IN EINEM NICHT-TERRISTRALEN NETZWERK | [2024/18] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COMPENSATING DOPPLER SHIFT IN NON-TERRISTRIAL NETWORK | [2024/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMPENSATION DE DÉCALAGE DOPPLER DANS UN RÉSEAU NON CRISTALLIN | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 02.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |