EP4357726 - SYSTEMS FOR AUTOMATED LOADING OF BLASTHOLES AND METHODS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyno Nobel Inc. 2795 East Cottonwood Parkway Suite 500 Salt Lake City, Utah 84121 / US | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AVERETT, Jeff Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | 02 /
GILTNER, Scott Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | 03 /
C'CONNOR, Patrick Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23206187.9 | 29.01.2019 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | US201862623094P | 29.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862623094 P | US201862782917P | 20.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862782917 P | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4357726 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4357726 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E21B41/00, E21B43/263, E21B47/00, F42D1/10, F42D3/04 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
F42D3/04 (EP,US);
E21B43/263 (KR);
F42D1/10 (EP,US);
E21B47/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2024/17] | F42D3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUM AUTOMATISIERTEN BELADEN VON SPRENGBOHRUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG DAMIT | [2024/17] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR AUTOMATED LOADING OF BLASTHOLES AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | [2024/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CHARGEMENT AUTOMATISÉ DE TROUS DE MINE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2024/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19744228.8 / EP3746631 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012323495 (ZHOU HANG [AU], et al); | [XA]WO2014123562 (DYNO NOBEL INC [US]); | [A]US2015003186 (XUE SHIZHONG [CN]); | [A]US2018010437 (REID ANTHONY [US], et al) |