EP4292564 - REDUCED FORM FACTOR ORAL IRRIGATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Water Pik, Inc. 1730 East Prospect Road Fort Collins, CO 80553-0001 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENFF, Oscar Broomfield, 80020 / US | 02 /
WAGNER, Robert D. Firestone, 80504 / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP, et al Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/51] | Sayer, Kathryn Isis Ariel, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 23206316.4 | 25.01.2017 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US201662286925P | 25.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662286925 P | US201662416926P | 03.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662416926 P | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4292564 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4292564 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/02 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
A61C17/0202 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61C17/02 (CN);
A61C1/0092 (KR,US);
A61C17/024 (EP,KR,US);
A61C17/16 (CN,KR);
A61C17/225 (EP,KR,US);
A61H13/005 (KR,US);
A61M3/0258 (EP,KR,US);
A61M39/26 (KR,US);
F04B17/03 (CN,KR);
F04B53/00 (CN);
F04B53/10 (CN,KR);
F04B53/16 (CN,KR);
F16F15/02 (CN,KR);
H01H13/06 (CN,KR);
H01H13/14 (CN,KR);
H01R13/46 (CN,KR);
H02K7/06 (CN,KR);
H02K7/1004 (CN,KR);
A61H2201/1246 (KR,US);
A61M2039/242 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/38] |
Former [2023/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ORALER IRRIGATOR MIT REDUZIERTEM FORMFAKTOR | [2023/51] | English: | REDUCED FORM FACTOR ORAL IRRIGATOR | [2023/51] | French: | IRRIGATEUR ORAL À FACTEUR DE FORME RÉDUIT | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/38] | 13.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17704141.5 / EP3407828 | EP20199852.3 / EP3777763 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0541516U (UNKNOWN) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0024] * * figures 1-12 *; | [A]KR20140099673 (AQUAPICK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0026] ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2015147717 (TAYLOR KURT M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0044] - [0124] * * figures 1-18 *; | [A]US2015173850 (GARRIGUES JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0098] * * figures 1-19 * |