EP4316537 - REGENERATION OF DAMAGED TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited Clonshaugh Business & Technology Park Dublin 17, D17 E400 / IE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Anthony Steven New South Wales, 2006 / AU | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23206907.0 | 13.08.2014 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | AU20130903092 | 13.08.2013 Original published format: AU 2013903092 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4316537 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4316537 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/39, A61L27/22, A61L27/36, A61L27/26, A61F13/02, A61K9/70, A61P17/02 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A61F13/00063 (EP,KR,MX,US);
A61K38/39 (EP,KR,MX,RU,US);
C07K14/78 (MX,US);
A61F13/0213 (EP,KR,MX,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,KR,MX,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,MX,US);
A61K9/70 (EP,KR,MX,US);
A61L27/22 (EP,KR,MX,US);
A61L27/3633 (EP,KR,MX,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,KR,MX,US);
A61P17/02 (EP,KR);
A61P41/00 (EP,RU);
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | A61L27/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | REGENERIERUNG VON GESCHÄDIGTEM GEWEBE | [2024/06] | English: | REGENERATION OF DAMAGED TISSUE | [2024/06] | French: | RÉGÉNÉRATION DE TISSU ENDOMMAGÉ | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14836821.0 / EP3033099 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9414958 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al); | [A]WO9806830 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al); | [A]WO0156595 (ENSLEY BURT D [US]); | [A]WO2008058323 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al); | [Y]WO2010102337 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al); | [Y]WO2013044314 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al); | [A]US2013164340 (ENSLEY BURT D [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2012068619 |