EP4345769 - SYSTEMS, DEVICES, AND METHODS FOR DETECTING FERTILITY AND GENDER OF UNHATCHED EGGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matrixspec Solutions Inc. 500 Morgan Blvd., Suite 201-202 Baie D'Urfé, QC H9X 3V1 / CA | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGADI, Michael Quebec, H9X 3V1 / CA | 02 /
LIU, Li Quebec, H9X 3V1 / CA | 03 /
ZHENG, Chen Quebec, H9X 3V1 / CA | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23207453.4 | 17.02.2016 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | US201562116954P | 17.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562116954 P | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4345769 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4345769 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G01N21/25, G01J3/32, G01N33/08, A01K43/00, G06V10/56 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
A01K43/00 (EP,US);
G06F18/211 (EP,US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06F18/253 (US);
G06T7/40 (US);
G06T7/90 (US);
G06V10/56 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (US);
G06V20/10 (EP);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20024 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/14] | G06V10/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG DER FRUCHTBARKEIT UND DES GESCHLECHTS VON NICHT AUSGEBRÜTETEN EIERN | [2024/14] | English: | SYSTEMS, DEVICES, AND METHODS FOR DETECTING FERTILITY AND GENDER OF UNHATCHED EGGS | [2024/14] | French: | SYSTÈMES, DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION DE LA FERTILITÉ ET DU SEXE D'OEUFS NON ÉCLOS | [2024/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16751842.2 / EP3259577 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010150265 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al); | [A]CN103033512 (UNIV NANJING AGRICULTURAL); | [A]CN104316473 (UNIV NANJING AGRICULTURAL); |