EP4293468 - ROBOTIC MOWER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globe (Jiangsu) Co., Ltd. No.65(3-4) Xinggang Road Zhonglou District Changzhou Jiangsu 213023 / CN | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Wei Jiangsu, 213023 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Yanliang Jiangsu, 213023 / CN | 03 /
ZHUANG, Xian Jiangsu, 213023 / CN | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 23207591.1 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | CN202011528932 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011528932 | CN202023114272U | 22.12.2020 Original published format: CN 202023114272 U | CN202011544830 | 24.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011544830 | CN202011544833 | 24.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011544833 | CN202011549714 | 24.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011549714 | CN202011557449 | 24.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011557449 | CN202023154432U | 24.12.2020 Original published format: CN 202023154432 U | CN202023155210U | 24.12.2020 Original published format: CN 202023155210 U | CN202011606822 | 30.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011606822 | CN202023283031U | 30.12.2020 Original published format: CN 202023283031 U | [2023/51] | Previously filed application, date | EP20210216244 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4293468 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4293468 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/243, G05D1/246, G05D1/248, G05D1/648, // G05D105/15, G05D107/20, G05D109/10, G05D111/10 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G05D1/243 (EP);
G05D1/0219 (US);
A01D34/008 (US);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/0225 (US);
G05D1/0238 (US);
G05D1/0246 (US);
G05D1/0272 (US);
G05D1/0274 (US);
G05D1/0278 (US);
G05D1/2297 (EP);
G05D1/246 (EP);
G05D1/248 (EP);
G05D1/6484 (EP);
A01D2101/00 (US);
G05D2105/15 (EP);
G05D2107/23 (EP);
G05D2109/10 (EP);
G05D2111/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | ROBOTERMÄHER UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/51] | English: | ROBOTIC MOWER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2023/51] | French: | TONDEUSE ROBOTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21216244.0 / EP4020112 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009055020 (JEONG WOO-YEON [KR], et al); | [Y]US2015150428 (PARK YOUNG JAE [KR], et al); | [Y]US2016091898 (BOOHER STEVEN R [US]); | [Y]US2018267552 (ARTES HAROLD [AT], et al) |