EP4373038 - PROCESSING SYSTEM, RELATED INTEGRATED CIRCUIT, DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Application GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 18 85609 Aschheim-Dornach / DE | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONDINI, Mirko I-95126 Catania / IT | 02 /
TRECARICHI, Calogero Andrea I-93012 Gela (Caltanissetta) / IT | 03 /
RENNIG, Fred D-85405 Nandlstadt / DE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emmanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2024/21] | Meindl, Tassilo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 23207659.6 | 03.11.2023 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | IT20220023610 | 16.11.2022 Original published format: IT202200023610 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373038 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
H04L12/40006 (EP);
H04L12/40013 (CN);
G06F13/4282 (CN,US);
G06F12/06 (CN);
G06F13/28 (CN);
G06F13/4068 (CN);
G06F9/45558 (CN);
G06F9/5027 (CN);
G06F2213/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2024/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, ZUGEHÖRIGE INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2024/21] | English: | PROCESSING SYSTEM, RELATED INTEGRATED CIRCUIT, DEVICE AND METHOD | [2024/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT, CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ ASSOCIÉ, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ | [2024/21] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 19.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9506378 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]); | [A]EP1085722 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) | by applicant | EP1085722 | US10678726 |