EP4296218 - EMERGENCY RELEASE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF RELEASING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emco Wheaton GmbH Emcostrasse 2-4 35274 Kirchhain / DE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARZOLA, Filippo Kirchhain / DE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/52] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 23207827.9 | 13.09.2019 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | US201862731450P | 14.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862731450 P | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4296218 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4296218 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16L29/00, B63B27/25, B63B27/30, B63B27/34, B67D9/00, B67D9/02, F16L37/08, F16L55/10, B67D7/32 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
F16L55/1015 (EP,US);
B67D9/00 (EP);
B67D9/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/52] | B67D7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NOTENTRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM UND ENTRIEGELUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/52] | English: | EMERGENCY RELEASE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF RELEASING THEREOF | [2023/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LIBÉRATION D'URGENCE ET MÉTHODE DE LIBÉRATION | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 31.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19858913.7 / EP3850259 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US8336579 (LE DEVEHAT RENAUD [FR], et al) [X] 1-6,11-14 * column 5, line 6 - column 9, line 42; figures 2a-2c,3a,4,5 * [A] 7 [Y] 8,9; | [A]JP2013160350 (NIIGATA LOADING SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]WO2014167343 (ALPHA PROCESS CONTROL [GB]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3274775 (KLAW PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) [A] 13 * paragraphs [0034] - [0039] - [0458]; figure 39 *; | [XAY]JP6348924B (TOKYO BOEKI ENG LTD) [X] 1,3-6,10-12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0065]; figure - * [A] 7 [Y] 8,9 |