EP4390897 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING LANDING OF AIR MOBILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY 12, Heolleung-ro, Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | For all designated states Kia Corporation 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyun Jin 18280 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ho Jun 18280 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
LEE, Joo Hyun 18280 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 23208515.9 | 08.11.2023 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | KR20220180757 | 21.12.2022 Original published format: KR 20220180757 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390897 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, G08G5/02 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/025 (EP,KR);
G05D1/101 (US);
G08G5/0026 (EP);
H04B7/18502 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER LANDUNG EINES LUFTFAHRZEUGS | [2024/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING LANDING OF AIR MOBILITY VEHICLE | [2024/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ATTERRISSAGE D'UN VÉHICULE DE MOBILITÉ AÉRIENNE | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20190110499 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]WO2021228107 (BEIJING SANKUAI ONLINE TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN113920784 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN114721441 (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS & ASTRONAUTICS) |