EP4368513 - AIRCRAFT LATCH ASSEMBLY WITH LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohr, Inc. 850 Lagoon Drive Chula Vista, CA 91910-2098 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIVARUDRAPPA, Shashidhar 560040 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
CHALLAMREDDY, Sangareddy 585403 Bidar / IN | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 23209234.6 | 10.11.2023 | [2024/20] | Priority number, date | IN202211064346 | 10.11.2022 Original published format: IN202211064346 | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4368513 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B64D29/06, E05B9/00, E05C19/14 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B64D29/06 (EP,US);
E05C3/08 (US);
E05B13/10 (EP);
E05C19/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGVERRIEGELUNGSANORDNUNG MIT SCHLOSS | [2024/20] | English: | AIRCRAFT LATCH ASSEMBLY WITH LOCK | [2024/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE VERROU D'AÉRONEF AVEC VERROU | [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE467209 (AMAL LIMITED) [A] 1 * figures 3-5 *; | [YA]US2904141 (HENRICHS BERNARD W) [Y] 1-8,11-13,15 * figures 1-6 * [A] 9,10,14; | [Y]US4159137 (RICHTER ROBERT D [US]) [Y] 1-8,11-13,15 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5073075 (DURAN JOHN A [US]) [Y] 1-8,11-13,15 * figures 14-18 *; | [A]US2017306669 (HELSLEY THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2018320724 (BOWERS NED C [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-2 * |