EP4344720 - DEVICE FOR RETAINING HUMIDITY IN A PATIENT INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLEY, Liam Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | 02 /
CONNELL, Emma Anne Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23209388.0 | 23.04.2015 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | AU20140901476 | 23.04.2014 Original published format: AU 2014901476 | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4344720 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4344720 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/0605 (US);
A61M16/22 (US);
A61M16/0063 (EP,US);
A61M16/0066 (EP,US);
A61M16/0075 (EP,US);
A61M16/0633 (EP,US);
A61M16/0683 (EP,US);
A61M16/0866 (EP,US);
A61M16/1045 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A61M16/109 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2205/02 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3365 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3389 (EP,US);
A61M2205/42 (EP,US);
A61M2206/11 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZURÜCKHALTEN VON FEUCHTIGKEIT IN EINER PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLE | [2024/14] | English: | DEVICE FOR RETAINING HUMIDITY IN A PATIENT INTERFACE | [2024/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉTENTION D'HUMIDITÉ DANS UNE INTERFACE PATIENT | [2024/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15783428.4 / EP3134158 | EP21176960.9 / EP3892318 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009320851 (SELVARAJAN KARTHIKEYAN [AU], et al); | [A]US2011232646 (HO PETER CHI FAI [US], et al); | [A]US2013190643 (BRAMBILLA ENRICO [US]) | by applicant | US4782832 | US4944310 | WO9804310 | WO9834665 | WO0078381 | US6532959 | US6581594 | WO2004073778 | WO2005063328 | WO2006074513 | WO2006130903 | US2009044808 | US2009050156 | WO2009052560 | US2010000534 | WO2010135785 | US7866944 | US2011023874 | WO2012171072 | WO2013020167 | US8638014 | US8636479 |