EP4333550 - MINIMUM SCHEDULING DELAY SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANG, Peter Pui Lok San Diego / US | 02 /
SORIAGA, Joseph Binamira San Diego / US | 03 /
XU, Huilin San Diego / US | 04 /
LEE, Heechoon San Diego / US | 05 /
SANKAR, Hari San Diego / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 23209685.9 | 27.09.2019 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | US201862739084P | 28.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862739084 P | US201962791445P | 11.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791445 P | US201962828220P | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828220 P | US201962847045P | 13.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962847045 P | US201916584833 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: US201916584833 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4333550 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4333550 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, // H04W80/02 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04W72/1273 (US);
H04L1/0026 (US);
H04L25/0226 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04L5/0092 (US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
|
Former IPC [2024/10] | H04W80/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/43] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNG MIT MINIMALER ZEITPLANUNGSVERZOGERUNG | [2024/10] | English: | MINIMUM SCHEDULING DELAY SIGNALING | [2024/10] | French: | SIGNALISATION D'UN RETARD MINIMAL D'ORDONNANCEMENT | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/43] | 15.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19789817.4 / EP3858037 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017213421 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-9 * figure 7 *; | [A]CN108076455 (BEIJING XINWEI TELECOM TECH INC, et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0077] - [0084] - [0 88] - [0092] - [ 109] - [0111] - [ 118] - [0124]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2018175805 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 6, lines 16-35 ** page 8, lines 7-22 *; | US2019342864 [ ] (HWANG DAESUNG [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0050] , [0 54] , [0 59] , [0 69] , [0 70] , [0 87] - [0089] * |