EP4372869 - BATTERY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto SE Kraillinger Straße 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegener, Fritz Stockdorf / DE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 23210141.0 | 15.11.2023 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | DE202210130226 | 15.11.2022 Original published format: DE102022130226 | [2024/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4372869 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4372869 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/625, H01M10/647, H01M10/653, H01M10/613, H01M10/6554 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
H01M10/625 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/658 (EP,KR);
H01M50/593 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/653 (EP,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP);
H01M10/613 (EP,CN);
H01M10/63 (KR);
H01M10/647 (EP);
H01M10/6554 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,US);
H01M50/258 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
H01M50/588 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/21] | H01M10/625 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2024/21] | English: | BATTERY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2024/21] | French: | BATTERIE POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2024/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE102012221689 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al); | [X]US2018123192 (FEES HEINER [DE], et al); | [XAI]DE102018102957 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [XI]KR20210064934 (LG ENERGY SOLUTION LTD [KR]) | by applicant | DE102021000981 |