EP4376579 - DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoo, Jewon 17113 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Dongjo 17113 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Youngji 17113 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Hyun 17113 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Won, Seonggeun 17113 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Lee, Seungmin 17113 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Hwang, Soukjune 17113 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 23210406.7 | 16.11.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | KR20220157505 | 22.11.2022 Original published format: KR 20220157505 | KR20230061733 | 12.05.2023 Original published format: KR 20230061733 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4376579 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/80, H10K77/10, // H10K102/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H10K77/111 (EP,US);
H10K59/127 (US);
H10K59/1201 (US);
H10K59/873 (EP);
H10K2102/311 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/22] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2024/22] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3564781 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US2021202853 (AN HYUNJIN [KR], et al); | [X]KR102403197B |