EP4393853 - DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING INDIVIDUAL GOODS TO A FURTHER CONVEYING DEVICE, A CONVEYING SYSTEM AND A TRANSFERRING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERAG AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENILE, Roberto 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 23210415.8 | 16.11.2023 | [2024/27] | Priority number, date | CH20220001376 | 18.11.2022 Original published format: CH 13762022 | [2024/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393853 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/53, B65G47/76, B65G47/84, B65G47/94, B65G47/82 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
B65G47/766 (EP);
B07C5/362 (CH);
B07C3/065 (CH);
B65G47/53 (EP);
B65G47/642 (CH);
B65G47/82 (EP,CH);
B65G47/841 (EP);
B65G47/845 (EP);
B65G47/945 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERGABE VON EINZELNEN FÖRDERGÜTERN AN EINE WEITERFÖRDERVORRICHTUNG SOWIE EIN FÖRDERSYSTEM UND EIN ÜBERGABEVERFAHREN | [2024/27] | English: | DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING INDIVIDUAL GOODS TO A FURTHER CONVEYING DEVICE, A CONVEYING SYSTEM AND A TRANSFERRING METHOD | [2024/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE MARCHANDISES INDIVIDUELLES À UN DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT ULTÉRIEUR AINSI QUE SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10126876 (KNAPP LOGISTIK AUTOMATION [AT]); | [X]WO2004085295 (RAPISTAN SYS ADVERTISING CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2010085141 (MAREL STORK POULTRY PROC BV [NL], et al); | [X]EP3686134 (SOLYSTIC [FR]); | [X]EP3882180 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]); | [XA]WO2022002510 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |