EP4371550 - FRAGRANCE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 37-1, Kamata 5-chome Ota-ku Tokyo 144-8721 / JP | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIHARA, Hisashi Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540073 / JP | 02 /
KASHIWAGI, Takahiro Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540073 / JP | 03 /
KUWAHARA, Yukari Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 2540073 / JP | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 23210497.6 | 17.11.2023 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | JP20220185399 | 21.11.2022 Original published format: JP 2022185399 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371550 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/31, A61K8/33, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/46, A61K8/92, A61Q13/00, // A61Q15/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (US);
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/33 (EP);
A61K8/34 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/46 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (US);
A61Q5/02 (US);
A61Q5/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUFTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2024/21] | English: | FRAGRANCE COMPOSITION | [2024/21] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PARFUM | [2024/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2021193429 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [XY]US2021361547 (HOLLAND LYNETTE ANNE MAKINS [GB], et al); | by applicant | JP2004263102 | JP2007014749 | JP2011184469 | JP2017165959 |