EP4375922 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR VERTEBRAL BODY RECOGNITION IN MEDICAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Claripi Inc. 2F, 3F, 4F, 11, Ihwajang 1-gil Jongno-gu Seoul 03088 / KR | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jong Hyo 02861 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Chang Won 16855 Yongin / KR | 03 /
LEE, Je Myoung 10592 Goyang / KR | 04 /
KIM, Tae Jin 06570 Seoul / KR | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Patentanwälte Montgelasstraße 2 81679 München / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 23211412.4 | 22.11.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | KR20220158696 | 23.11.2022 Original published format: KR 20220158696 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375922 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/11 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP);
G06V20/60 (US);
G06T15/10 (US);
G06T5/70 (US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06V10/77 (US);
G06V20/50 (US);
G16H30/40 (US);
G06T2207/10081 (US);
G06T2207/10088 (US);
G06T2207/10104 (US);
G06T2207/20021 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30012 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIRBELKÖRPERERKENNUNG IN MEDIZINISCHEN BILDERN | [2024/22] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR VERTEBRAL BODY RECOGNITION IN MEDICAL IMAGES | [2024/22] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE DE CORPS VERTÉBRAL DANS DES IMAGES MÉDICALES | [2024/22] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | KR20200073953 |