EP4376065 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MICROELECTRONIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D-Micromac AG Technologie-Campus 8 09126 Chemnitz / DE | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leichsenring, Torsten 08134 Wildenfels / DE | 02 /
Li, Qingfeng 09130 Chemnitz / DE | 03 /
Clair, Maurice 09125 Chemnitz / DE | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 23211468.6 | 22.11.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | DE202210212677 | 28.11.2022 Original published format: DE102022212677 | [2024/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4376065 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/78, // H01L33/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H01L21/7806 (EP);
H01L21/7813 (EP);
H01L33/0093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MIKROELEKTRONISCHER KOMPONENTEN | [2024/22] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MICROELECTRONIC COMPONENTS | [2024/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSANTS MICROELECTRONIQUES | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US9966260 (CHAN CLAYTON KA TSUN [US], et al); | [YD]DE102017205635 (3D MICROMAC AG [DE]); | [Y]US2019173029 (JIN XIANG [CN]) | by applicant | DE102017205635 |