EP4382809 - MATTRESS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neugebauer, Johannes 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | 02 /
Ahlers, Dirk 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 23211572.5 | 22.11.2023 | [2024/24] | Priority number, date | DE202210132769 | 09.12.2022 Original published format: DE102022132769 | [2024/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4382809 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, A21B3/02, E05F15/42, F24C15/02, A47J36/00, A47L15/00 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
F24C7/085 (EP);
A21B3/02 (EP);
E05F15/43 (EP);
F24C15/02 (EP);
A47J37/0629 (EP);
A47L15/4257 (EP);
A47L15/4295 (EP);
E05F2015/434 (EP);
E05Y2900/30 (EP);
E05Y2900/308 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATRATZENSYSTEM | [2024/24] | English: | MATTRESS SYSTEM | [2024/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MATELAS | [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102006029902 (MIWE MICHAEL WENZ GMBH [DE]); | [XI]EP3584400 (ITW IND GMBH [DE]) |