EP4338799 - TUMOR INFILTRATING LYMPHOCYTES AND METHODS OF THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regents of the University of Minnesota 600 McNamara Alumni Center 200 Oak Street SE Minneapolis, MN 55455 / US | For all designated states Intima Bioscience, Inc. 3 Columbus Circle New York, New York 10019 / US | For all designated states The United States Of America, As Represented By The Secretary, Department Of Health And Human Services 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIARITY, Branden Shoreview, 55126-8516 / US | 02 /
WEBBER, Beau Coon Rapids / US | 03 /
CHOUDHRY, Modassir New York, 10019 / US | 04 /
ROSENBERG, Steven A. Potomac, 20854 / US | 05 /
PALMER, Douglas C. N. Bethesda, 20852 / US | 06 /
RESTIFO, Nicholas P. Chevy Chase, 20815 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 23211578.2 | 18.10.2017 | [2024/12] | Priority number, date | US201662409651P | 18.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662409651 P | US201762452244P | 30.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762452244 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4338799 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4338799 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, C12N15/113, C12N9/22, C12N5/0783, C07K14/47, C07K14/705, C07K14/715, C12N5/078, A61K39/00, A61P31/12, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,GB,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,GB,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,GB,US);
A61K2239/52 (EP,GB,US);
A61K2239/57 (EP,GB,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,GB,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,GB,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P31/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/10 (GB);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
C07K14/70503 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (US);
C07K14/70521 (EP,US);
C07K14/7158 (EP,US);
C12N15/79 (US);
C12N15/902 (US);
C12N5/0634 (EP,GB,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,GB,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
A61K2300/00 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2510/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/12] | A61P31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | TUMORINFILTRIERENDE LYMPHOZYTEN UND THERAPIEVERFAHREN | [2024/12] | English: | TUMOR INFILTRATING LYMPHOCYTES AND METHODS OF THERAPY | [2024/12] | French: | LYMPHOCYTES INFILTRANT LES TUMEURS ET PROCÉDÉS DE THÉRAPIE | [2024/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17861792.4 / EP3529359 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009220488 (GARDNER HUMPHREY [US]); | [A]US2015259684 (CHURCH GEORGE M [US], et al); | [Y]WO2015143328 (H LEE MOFFITT CANCER CT & RES [US], et al); | [AP]US2017065636 (MORIARITY BRANDEN [US], et al); | by applicant | US6120766 |