EP4375495 - AIRCRAFT POWER PLANT WITH INTERBURNER AND METHOD OF OPERATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP. 1000 Marie Victorin, (01BE5) Longueuil, Québec J4G 1A1 / CA | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLAMONDON, Etienne (01BE5) Longueuil, J4G 1A1 / CA | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/22] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 23211852.1 | 23.11.2023 | [2024/22] | Priority number, date | US202218058755 | 24.11.2022 Original published format: US202218058755 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375495 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/00, F02C6/12, F02C7/26, F02C9/28, F02C9/52, F02C9/54, F02C9/56, F02C5/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
F02C7/26 (EP);
F23R3/16 (US);
B64D27/10 (US);
B64D31/00 (US);
B64D33/02 (US);
F02B37/00 (EP);
F02B41/10 (EP);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02C5/00 (EP);
F02C6/003 (EP);
F02C6/12 (EP);
F02C9/285 (EP);
F02C9/52 (EP);
F02C9/54 (EP);
F02C9/56 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGKRAFTWERK MIT ZWISCHENBRENNER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2024/22] | English: | AIRCRAFT POWER PLANT WITH INTERBURNER AND METHOD OF OPERATING | [2024/22] | French: | CENTRALE ÉLECTRIQUE D'AÉRONEF AVEC BRÛLEUR INTERMÉDIAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3996747 (MELCHIOR JEAN F); | [A]US5661967 (FARKAS FRANZ [CH], et al); | [A]US10145291 (THOMASSIN JEAN [CA], et al); | [A]US2022243667 (RAMBO JEFFREY DOUGLAS [US]) | by applicant | US7753036 | US7775044 | US2015275749 | US2015275756 |