EP4302714 - ABLATION CATHETER WITH A FLEXIBLE PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAR-TAL, Meir 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
REUVENI, Avi 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 03 /
HIRSZOWICZ, Eran 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 23212586.4 | 11.09.2017 | [2024/02] | Priority number, date | US201615262705 | 12.09.2016 Original published format: US201615262705 | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4302714 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4302714 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B18/00 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B2018/00029 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00083 (IL,US);
A61B2018/00101 (IL,US);
A61B2018/00351 (CN);
A61B2018/00595 (CN);
A61B2018/00773 (CN);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00797 (CN,IL,US);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/1407 (CN);
A61B2018/1467 (CN,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/02] | A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | ABLATIONSKATHETER MIT EINER FLEXIBLEN LEITERPLATTE | [2024/02] | English: | ABLATION CATHETER WITH A FLEXIBLE PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD | [2024/02] | French: | CATHÉTER D'ABLATION AVEC CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ FLEXIBLE | [2024/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17190450.1 / EP3292833 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007219551 (HONOUR KIRK S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 2-14,17,21,22 *; | [A]US2011160726 (INGLE FRANK [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 6 *; | [Y]EP2564801 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [Y] 14 * figures 2,5 *; | [Y]US2014058375 (KOBLISH JOSEF V [US]) [Y] 2,5 * paragraph [0068] *; | [A]US2014276052 (RANKIN DARRELL L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 13 *; | [A]WO2016065337 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-20 *; | [XYI]EP3020355 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10,11,13,15 * paragraph [0028]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 2,5,14 [I] 8,9,12 | by applicant | US8147486 | US2013030426 | US8529476 | WO2014124231 |