EP4386553 - HARDWARE MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, William Kings Langley, Hertfordshire, WD4 8LZ / GB | 02 /
ELKHIDIR, Ahmed Kings Langley, Hertfordshire, WD4 8LZ / GB | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 23212787.8 | 28.11.2023 | [2024/25] | Priority number, date | GB20220018962 | 15.12.2022 Original published format: GB 202218962 | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4386553 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G06F9/5044 (EP);
G06F8/443 (GB);
G06F9/44505 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARDWARE-ABBILDUNG | [2024/25] | English: | HARDWARE MAPPING | [2024/25] | French: | MAPPAGE DE MATÉRIEL | [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011079942 (VORBACH MARTIN [DE], et al); | [XAI]EP2750328 (TELEFONICA SA [ES]); | [A]CN113821208 (UNIV TSINGHUA) |