EP4306154 - HIGH FLOW LUER CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland, 2013 / NZ | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYES, Richard John 2013 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
LAUS, Charlotte Grace 2013 Auckland / NZ | 03 /
FISCHER, Christian Francis 2013 Auckland / NZ | 04 /
VERDOOLD, Vincent 2013 Auckland / NZ | 05 /
IP, Bernard Tsz Lun 2013 Auckland / NZ | 06 /
CHAN, Jessica Kristen 2013 Auckland / NZ | 07 /
GHALIB, Ali Ghalib Abdul Rahman 2013 Auckland / NZ | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 23213304.1 | 23.11.2017 | [2024/03] | Priority number, date | US201662426052P | 23.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662426052 P | US201762565859P | 29.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762565859 P | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4306154 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4306154 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/10, A61M13/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61M13/003 (EP,US);
A61M39/10 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M16/0816 (EP,US);
A61M16/0875 (EP,US);
A61M16/109 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M16/105 (EP,US);
A61M16/1095 (EP,US);
A61M16/161 (EP,US);
A61M16/208 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0033 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1033 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0225 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0227 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2024/03] | A61M13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | SCHNELLFLUSS-LUER-VERBINDER | [2024/03] | English: | HIGH FLOW LUER CONNECTOR | [2024/03] | French: | RACCORD LUER À DÉBIT ÉLEVÉ | [2024/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17873263.2 / EP3544668 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4580816 (CAMPBELL RANDOLPH E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11,13 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US2006217683 (PATANIA ANDREW C [US]) [X] 1,3,7,13,14 * the whole document * [A] 12 [I] 15; | [X]US2008284167 (LIM EUGENE [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-9,13 * paragraph [0038]; figure 6 ** paragraph [0055]; claims 5,9 *; | [XP]EP3202455 (BRAUN AVITUM AG [DE]) [XP] 1-4,7,10,11,13,14 * figure 2 * | by applicant | US2013098360 | US2013220326 | US2013233318 | WO2015142192 | WO2016048172 |