EP4379038 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PORATING AND LOADING CELLS, ESPECIALLY IMMUNOCOMPETENT CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horia Hulubei National Institute for R & D in Physics and Nuclear Engineering (IFIN-HH) Reactorului No. 30 077125 Magurele / RO | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jurca, Marius 63486 Bruchköbel / DE | 02 /
Spohr, Klaus, Dr. Paisley, Scotland, PA2 0TX / GB | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 23213306.6 | 30.11.2023 | [2024/23] | Priority number, date | DE202210132083 | 02.12.2022 Original published format: DE102022132083 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4379038 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C12N13/00 (EP,US);
C12M35/04 (EP,US);
A61K41/0047 (US);
A61K51/1203 (US);
C12M27/20 (EP);
C12M29/18 (EP);
C12M35/00 (EP);
C12M35/02 (EP);
C12M41/00 (EP,US);
C12M41/36 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PORATION UND BELADUNG VON ZELLEN, INSBESONDERE IMMUNKOMPETENTEN ZELLEN | [2024/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PORATING AND LOADING CELLS, ESPECIALLY IMMUNOCOMPETENT CELLS | [2024/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION DE PORES ET DE CHARGEMENT DE CELLULES, NOTAMMENT DE CELLULES IMMUNOCOMPETENTES | [2024/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO9817342 | WO2007028984 | US2010196983 | WO2016005752 | JP2016159107 | US9855298 | JP2018099059 | WO2019181018 | WO2020109953 | CN112675442 | US2022062611 | WO2022147014 | FR3120630 | CN115215851 | CN115232129 | WO2022241151 | WO2022238962 | WO2022241036 |