EP4307743 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SSP DEVICE AND SERVER TO NEGOTIATE DIGITAL CERTIFICATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Kangjin Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Duckey Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Hyewon Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 04 /
Koo, Jonghoe Suwon-si 16677 / KR | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 23213721.6 | 09.09.2019 | [2024/03] | Priority number, date | KR20180107384 | 07.09.2018 Original published format: KR 20180107384 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4307743 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4307743 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/30, H04W4/60, H04W12/40, // H04W12/069, H04W12/0431, H04L9/40 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04W4/60 (EP);
H04L9/3268 (KR,US);
H04W12/0431 (EP,US);
H04L63/166 (EP,US);
H04L9/0844 (US);
H04L9/0861 (KR);
H04L9/3213 (KR);
H04L9/3265 (US);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W12/069 (EP);
H04W12/35 (EP);
H04W12/40 (EP);
H04W28/18 (US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04L63/205 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/03] | H04W12/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR SSP-VORRICHTUNG UND SERVER ZUR VERHANDLUNG VON DIGITALEN ZERTIFIKATEN | [2024/03] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SSP DEVICE AND SERVER TO NEGOTIATE DIGITAL CERTIFICATES | [2024/03] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UN DISPOSITIF SSP ET UN SERVEUR POUR NÉGOCIER DES CERTIFICATS NUMÉRIQUES | [2024/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19857430.3 / EP3824594 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |