EP4382587 - A PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF NEEDLE COKE AND AROMATICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indian Oil Corporation Limited Indian Oil Bhavan G-9, Ali Yavar Jung Marg Bandra (East) Maharashtra, Mumbai 400 051 / IN | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIXIT, Shivam Ashok 121007 Haryana / IN | 02 /
PRADEEP, Ponoly Ramachandran 121007 Haryana / IN | 03 /
SARKAR, Mainak 121007 Haryana / IN | 04 /
DAS, Satyen Kumar 121007 Haryana / IN | 05 /
SAU, Madhusudan 121007 Haryana / IN | 06 /
RAMAKUMAR, Sankara Sri Venkata 121007 Haryana / IN | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 23213944.4 | 04.12.2023 | [2024/24] | Priority number, date | IN202221070151 | 05.12.2022 Original published format: IN202221070151 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4382587 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C10B55/00, C10B57/04, C10G55/04, C10G67/16, C10G69/14, C10G51/02, C10G55/06 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
C10B57/045 (EP);
C10B55/00 (EP,US);
C10B57/02 (US);
C10G51/023 (EP);
C10G55/04 (EP);
C10G55/06 (EP);
C10G67/16 (EP,US);
C10G69/14 (EP);
C10G2300/1096 (US);
C10G2300/201 (US);
C10G2300/4006 (US);
C10G2300/4012 (US);
C10G2300/4037 (US);
C10G2300/4081 (US);
C10G2300/708 (US);
C10G2400/30 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NADELKOKS UND AROMATEN | [2024/24] | English: | A PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF NEEDLE COKE AND AROMATICS | [2024/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COKE EN AIGUILLES ET DE COMPOSÉS AROMATIQUES | [2024/24] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20160110711 (HANWHA TOTAL PETROCHEMICAL CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]CN115216335 (ZHANGJIAGANG FREE TRADE ZONE HUIXIN CHEMICAL TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | US4177133 | US4466883 | US4547284 | US5286371 | CN101302443 | US7604731 | CN103102978 | US10125318 |