EP4382772 - DIFFERENTIAL GEAR ASSEMBLY, DRIVETRAIN FOR A VEHICLE, METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A DIFFERENTIAL GEAR ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR DISASSEMBLING A DIFFERENTIAL GEAR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEN, Erik 40531 Göteborg / SE | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 23214290.1 | 05.12.2023 | [2024/24] | Priority number, date | EP20220211467 | 05.12.2022 Original published format: EP 22211467 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4382772 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16H48/08, F16H48/38, F16H48/40, F16H57/023, F16H57/08 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
F16H48/38 (EP);
F16H48/08 (EP);
F16H48/40 (EP);
F16H57/023 (EP);
F16H57/082 (EP);
F16H2048/085 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2024/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIFFERENTIALGETRIEBEANORDNUNG, ANTRIEBSSTRANG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG, VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER DIFFERENTIALGETRIEBEANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEMONTAGE EINER DIFFERENTIALGETRIEBEANORDNUNG | [2024/24] | English: | DIFFERENTIAL GEAR ASSEMBLY, DRIVETRAIN FOR A VEHICLE, METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A DIFFERENTIAL GEAR ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR DISASSEMBLING A DIFFERENTIAL GEAR ASSEMBLY | [2024/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE ENGRENAGE DIFFÉRENTIEL, CHAÎNE CINÉMATIQUE POUR UN VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN ENSEMBLE ENGRENAGE DIFFÉRENTIEL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSASSEMBLAGE D'UN ENSEMBLE ENGRENAGE DIFFÉRENTIEL | [2024/24] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 04.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004116235 (SZUBA JOSEPH [US]); | [XYI]EP2074339 (SKF AB [SE]); | [IAY]DE102019123969 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [Y]EP4015872 (NINGBO GEELY AUTOMOBILE RES & DEVELOPMENT CO LTD [CN], et al) |