EP4383482 - GROUND CONTACT CONNECTING MEMBER CONNECTOR AND CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Japan G.K. 3-5-8, Hisamoto Takatsu-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jiang, Ming Kawasaki-shi, 213-8535 / JP | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 23214557.3 | 06.12.2023 | [2024/24] | Priority number, date | JP20220194864 | 06.12.2022 Original published format: JP 2022194864 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4383482 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01R31/08, H01R12/71, H01R12/73, H01R12/91, H01R13/6471 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H01R31/085 (EP);
H01R13/02 (CN);
H01R13/112 (US);
H01R12/91 (EP,US);
H01R13/24 (CN);
H01R13/40 (CN);
H01R13/424 (US);
H01R4/66 (CN);
H01R12/712 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDER FÜR ERDUNGSKONTAKTVERBINDUNGSELEMENT UND VERBINDERANORDNUNG | [2024/24] | English: | GROUND CONTACT CONNECTING MEMBER CONNECTOR AND CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY | [2024/24] | French: | CONNECTEUR D'ÉLÉMENT DE CONNEXION DE CONTACT DE MASSE ET ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR | [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008220650 (WU CHUN-KUNG [TW]); | [XI]US7722403 (NEUMETZLER HEIKO [DE]) | by applicant | CN113346285 |