EP4389976 - SELF-PROPELLED CONSTRUCTION MACHINE AND METHOD FOR WORKING THE GROUND OR CONSTRUCTING A STRUCTURE ON THE GROUND WITH SUCH A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wirtgen GmbH Reinhard-Wirtgen-Strasse 2 53578 Windhagen / DE | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buschmann, Martin 67435 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Delius, Henning 67480 Edenkoben / DE | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Frank OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 23214724.9 | 06.12.2023 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | DE202210133913 | 19.12.2022 Original published format: DE102022133913 | [2024/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4389976 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/00, // E01C19/48, E01C23/08 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
E01C19/004 (EP);
E01C19/00 (CN);
G01S19/13 (US);
E01C19/12 (CN);
E01C19/23 (CN);
E01C21/00 (CN);
E01C23/085 (CN);
E01C23/12 (CN);
E02F3/76 (CN);
E02F9/00 (CN);
G05D1/247 (EP);
G05D1/248 (EP);
G05D1/646 (EP);
H04W24/08 (CN);
H04W24/10 (CN);
H04W4/02 (CN);
E01C19/48 (EP);
E01C23/088 (EP,US);
G05D2105/05 (EP);
G05D2107/90 (EP);
G05D2109/10 (EP);
G05D2111/32 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTFAHRENDE BAUMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG DES BODENS ODER ERRICHTUNG EINES BAUWERKS AUF DEM BODEN MIT EINER SOLCHEN BAUMASCHINE | [2024/26] | English: | SELF-PROPELLED CONSTRUCTION MACHINE AND METHOD FOR WORKING THE GROUND OR CONSTRUCTING A STRUCTURE ON THE GROUND WITH SUCH A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2024/26] | French: | ENGIN AUTOMOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAVAIL DU SOL OU DE CONSTRUCTION D'UNE STRUCTURE SUR LE SOL AVEC UN TEL ENGIN | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5761095 (WARREN LARRY K [US]); | [Y]DE112013000729T (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]); | [XYI]EP3611303 (WIRTGEN GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE19756676 |