EP4401046 - ARRANGEMENT FOR IMAGE-BASED RECOGNITION OF THE POSITION OF A LOADING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2024/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUER, PATRICK 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KHOT, AKSHAY 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2024/29] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2024/29] | Application number, filing date | 23215421.1 | 11.12.2023 | [2024/29] | Priority number, date | DE202310100540 | 11.01.2023 Original published format: DE102023100540 | [2024/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4401046 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/74, G06V10/764, G06V10/80, G06V20/56, G06V20/64, G06V20/70, A01B69/00, A01D43/073, A01D43/08, G06N3/096, G06T7/10, G06T7/73 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
G06V20/56 (EP);
G06T7/73 (EP,US);
A01D43/073 (EP);
A01D43/087 (EP);
G06N3/096 (EP);
G06T7/12 (US);
G06T7/593 (US);
G06V10/74 (EP);
G06V10/764 (EP);
G06V10/806 (EP);
G06V20/64 (EP);
G06V20/70 (EP);
A01B69/004 (EP);
G06T2207/10012 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/30252 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR BILDBASIERTEN ERKENNUNG DER POSITION EINES LADEBEHÄLTERS | [2024/29] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR IMAGE-BASED RECOGNITION OF THE POSITION OF A LOADING CONTAINER | [2024/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE LA POSITION D'UN CONTENEUR DE CHARGEMENT BASÉ SUR UNE IMAGE | [2024/29] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2021195840 (PURYK CORWIN MARCUS [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2022300039 | DE10064860 | DE102007009666 | EP2301318 | WO2013120062 | EP2893797 | EP3316218 | US2019294914 | EP3903558 | EP3949714 | WO2022130038 |