EP4312265 - ARRAY SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Chongqing BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No.7 Yunhan Rd. Shuitu Hi-Tech Industrial Zone Beibei District Chongqing 400714 / CN | [2024/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiaoyuan Beijing, 100176 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Wu Beijing, 100176 / CN | 03 /
FANG, Yan Beijing, 100176 / CN | 04 /
WU, Shengxue Beijing, 100176 / CN | [2024/05] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/05] | Application number, filing date | 23215698.4 | 18.12.2019 | [2024/05] | Priority number, date | CN20191030803 | 14.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910030803 | [2024/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4312265 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4312265 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1362, H01L23/485, H01L23/528 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H01L27/124 (EP,US);
G02F1/136227 (EP,US);
G02F1/13439 (US);
H01L23/485 (EP);
H01L23/528 (EP);
H01L27/1248 (EP);
H01L27/1259 (US);
G02F1/134363 (US);
G02F1/134372 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/05] | H01L23/528 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] | Title | German: | ARRAYSUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON SOWIE ANZEIGETAFEL | [2024/05] | English: | ARRAY SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND DISPLAY PANEL | [2024/05] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE RÉSEAU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE | [2024/05] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19910539.6 / EP3913427 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016048065 (ONO KIKUO [JP]); | [I]CN107065347 (SHANGHAI TIANMA MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [I]CN107093584 (SHANGHAI AVIC OPTOELECTRONICS) | by applicant | CN20191030803 |