EP4327660 - SELECTIVE WEED CONTROL USING D-NAPROPAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPL Limited Uniphos House Madhu Park 11th Road, Khar (West) Mumbai 400 052 MAH / IN | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHROFF, Jaidev Rajnikant 400 052 Mumbai / IN | 02 /
SHROFF, Vikram Rajnikant 400 052 Mumbai / IN | 03 /
HELLER, Jean-Jaques 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23215904.6 | 12.03.2014 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | US201313839979 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313839979 | GB20130004706 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: GB 201304706 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4327660 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Classification | IPC: | A01P13/02 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A01N39/02 (EP);
A01N43/80 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N39/02, A01N33/18, A01N37/22, A01N43/40, A01N43/707, A01N43/80 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N37/22 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE UNKRAUTBEKÄMPFUNG MIT D-NAPROPAMID | [2024/09] | English: | SELECTIVE WEED CONTROL USING D-NAPROPAMIDE | [2024/09] | French: | LUTTE SÉLECTIVE CONTRE LES MAUVAISES HERBES À L'AIDE DE D-NAPROPAMIDE | [2024/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14159214.7 / EP2777397 | EP17199996.4 / EP3318126 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US3718455 | US5583090 | US5783520 | USRE38675E | WO2009004642 | WO2011121407 |