EP4385296 - ADJUSTABLE MOUNT FOR IMPLEMENT CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macdon Industries Ltd. 680 Moray Street Winnipeg, Manitoba R3J 3S3 / CA | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bossaer, Austin Waunakee, 53597 / US | 02 /
Hundt, Karl Lake Mills, 53551 / US | 03 /
Monhollen, Nolan Sun Prairie, 53590 / US | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Metzgerstraße 61 52070 Aachen / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 23216204.0 | 13.12.2023 | [2024/25] | Priority number, date | US202218081807 | 15.12.2022 Original published format: US202218081807 | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4385296 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A01B69/00 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
A01B69/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLBARE HALTERUNG FÜR GERÄTEKAMERA | [2024/25] | English: | ADJUSTABLE MOUNT FOR IMPLEMENT CAMERA | [2024/25] | French: | MONTURE RÉGLABLE POUR CAMÉRA D'INSTRUMENT | [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3932162 (CLAAS E SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP3967119 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [X]EP3984341 (AMAZONEN WERKE H DREYER SE & CO KG [DE]) |