EP4387001 - CONNECTOR SAVER DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MacDonald, Dettwiler and Associates Inc. 9445 Airport Road Brampton, Ontario L6S 4J3 / CA | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stina, Nick Brampton, L6S 4J3 / CA | 02 /
Glidden, Max Brampton, L6S 4J3 / CA | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Humphrey-Evans, Edward John HEIPS 1 Hawkes Close Wokingham, Berkshire RG41 2SZ / GB | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 23216922.7 | 14.12.2023 | [2024/25] | Priority number, date | US202263432590P | 14.12.2022 Original published format: US 202263432590 P | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4387001 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/518, H01R13/621, H01R31/06 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H01R31/06 (EP);
H01R13/518 (EP,US);
H01R13/502 (US);
H01R13/621 (US);
H01R13/6215 (EP);
H01R13/642 (US);
H01R43/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SICHERN VON VERBINDERN | [2024/25] | English: | CONNECTOR SAVER DEVICE AND METHOD | [2024/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCONOMIE DE CONNECTEUR | [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5378173 (HASHIZAWA SHIGEMI [JP]); | [I]DE4447719 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]); | [XI]US2002173195 (BURGER EDWARD W [US]); | [XI]US2007275604 (VAN MEIJL HERMANUS FRANCISCUS [DE], et al); | [I]EP3232511 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) |