EP4317728 - SLIDING COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15, Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hiroshi 1058587 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
IMURA, Tadatsugu 1058587 Tokyo / JP | 03 /
OU, Iwa 1058587 Tokyo / JP | 04 /
TOKUNAGA, Yuichiro 1058587 Tokyo / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23216949.0 | 19.02.2020 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | JP20190029626 | 21.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019029626 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4317728 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4317728 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/04, F16C33/74, F16J15/34, F16C33/10 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
F16J15/3412 (EP);
F16C17/045 (EP,KR);
F16J15/3424 (US);
F16C33/1015 (EP);
F16C33/107 (EP);
F16C33/24 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | F16C33/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHIEBEKOMPONENTEN | [2024/06] | English: | SLIDING COMPONENTS | [2024/06] | French: | COMPOSANTS COULISSANTS | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 23.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20759684.2 / EP3929454 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4407453 (KAYSER ALBRECHT DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]US2007296156 (YANAGISAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [AD]WO2017002774 (EAGLE IND CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | WO2017002774 |