EP4390347 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION COMPRISING A THERMAL DETECTOR ON A READING SUBSTRATE, AN ACTIVE ELECTRONIC ELEMENT LOCATED AT THE MOST NEAR THE THERMAL DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment Le Ponant D 75015 Paris / FR | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Sébastien 38054 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
LEDUC, Patrick 38054 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 03 /
PERRILLAT-BOTTONET, Thomas 38054 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Brevalex 22 Avenue Doyen Louis Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 23218214.7 | 19.12.2023 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | FR20220014113 | 21.12.2022 Original published format: FR 2214113 | [2024/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390347 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/02 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G01J5/20 (EP);
H01L23/5226 (US);
G01J5/023 (EP);
G01J5/024 (EP);
H01L21/84 (US);
H01L24/05 (US);
H01L24/08 (US);
H01L25/0657 (US);
H01L27/12 (US);
H01L2224/05624 (US);
H01L2224/05647 (US);
H01L2224/05684 (US);
H01L2224/08145 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STRAHLUNG MIT EINEM THERMISCHEN DETEKTOR AUF EINEM AUSLESESUBSTRAT, DESSEN EIN AKTIVES ELEKTRONISCHES ELEMENT VOR DEM THERMISCHEN DETEKTOR ANGEORDNET IST | [2024/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION COMPRISING A THERMAL DETECTOR ON A READING SUBSTRATE, AN ACTIVE ELECTRONIC ELEMENT LOCATED AT THE MOST NEAR THE THERMAL DETECTOR | [2024/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'UN RAYONNEMENT ELECTROMAGNETIQUE COMPORTANT UN DETECTEUR THERMIQUE SUR UN SUBSTRAT DE LECTURE DONT UN ELEMENT ELECTRONIQUE ACTIF EST SITUE AU PLUS PRES DU DETECTEUR THERMIQUE | [2024/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]FR2999338 (SOC FR DETECTEURS INFRAROUGES SOFRADIR [FR]); | [Y]WO2019229353 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [Y]WO2020074838 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [Y]FR3089685 (ULIS [FR]) | by applicant | EP2743659 | EP2894445 |