EP4324568 - DISPENSER FOR VALVE WITH STATIONARY VALVE STEM HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DDP Specialty Electronic Materials US, LLC 974 Centre Road, Bldg. 730 Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROER, Daniel R. Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | 02 /
BLACK, Marc S. Midland, Michigan 48667 / US | 03 /
SCHUETTE, Chad V. Midland, Michigan 48667 / US | 04 /
SILER, Christopher J. Midland, Michigan 48667 / US | 05 /
RAMIREZ, Daniel Midland, Michigan 48667 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23218743.5 | 10.04.2019 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | US201862655292P | 10.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862655292 P | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4324568 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4324568 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/20, // B65D83/30, B65D83/48, B05B11/10 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B65D83/201 (EP,US);
B65D83/306 (US);
B05B11/1053 (EP,US);
B65D83/303 (EP,US);
B65D83/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2024/08] | B05B11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2024/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERTEILER FÜR VENTIL MIT FESTSTEHENDEM VENTILKÖRPERGEHÄUSE | [2024/08] | English: | DISPENSER FOR VALVE WITH STATIONARY VALVE STEM HOUSING | [2024/08] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR POUR SOUPAPE AVEC LOGEMENT DE TIGE DE SOUPAPE FIXE | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 03.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19719116.6 / EP3774592 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5702036 (FERRARA JR DANIEL A [US]); | [A]JP3096635U ; | [A]US2007090133 (MACLEOD ANDREW [GB], et al); | [AD]WO2017139131 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) | by applicant | US3506241 | US4436229 | US4856684 | US2013320045 | WO2017139128 | WO2017139131 |