EP4389333 - GEAR CUTTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M Services S.r.l. Via Silvio Pellico, 6 36075 Montecchio Maggiore (VI) / IT | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEZZO, Giorgio 36075 MONTECCHIO MAGGIORE (VI) / IT | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Marchioro, Paolo Studio Bonini S.r.l. Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 23219092.6 | 21.12.2023 | [2024/26] | Priority number, date | IT20220026418 | 22.12.2022 Original published format: IT202200026418 | [2024/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4389333 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23F21/16, B23F21/00, B23F23/12, B23F17/00 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
B23F21/16 (EP);
B23F17/006 (EP);
B23F21/005 (EP);
B23F23/1243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERZAHNUNGSMASCHINE | [2024/26] | English: | GEAR CUTTING MACHINE | [2024/26] | French: | MACHINE DE COUPE D'ENGRENAGES | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006010708 (LAMBERT WAHLI AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2006010709 (LAMBERT WAHLI AG [CH], et al); | [A]US2006174464 (FITZGERALD BRIAN M [US], et al); | [A]CN106583855 (CHONGQING MACHINE TOOL (GROUP) CO LTD); | [A]US2019314910 (WEIXLER JOHANNES [DE]); | [A]US10994352 (WEIXLER JOHANNES [DE], et al); | [A]CN114850584 (HUNAN ZDCY CNC EQUIP CO LTD ) |