EP4394250 - CAPACITY VERIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Europe N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖKÇE, Ali Erman 54300 Hendek / TR | 02 /
TÜR, Volkan 54300 Hendek / TR | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 23220343.0 | 27.12.2023 | [2024/27] | Priority number, date | TR20220020829 | 27.12.2022 Original published format: TR 202220829 | [2024/27] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4394250 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/24, F24H15/104, F24H15/112, F24H15/215, F24H15/219, F24H15/421, F24H9/20 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
F24H15/104 (EP);
F23N5/24 (EP);
F24H15/112 (EP);
F24H15/215 (EP);
F24H15/219 (EP);
F24H15/421 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPAZITÄTSVERIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2024/27] | English: | CAPACITY VERIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION THEREOF | [2024/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VÉRIFICATION DE CAPACITÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2980506 (RINNAI KK [JP]); | [XA]US10488042 (YANG DONG JIN [KR], et al) | by applicant | NL8102571 | CN211668039U |