EP4325544 - POWER SUPPLY FOR AN IMAGE INTENSIFIER OF A NIGHT VISION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elbit Systems of America, LLC 4700 Marine Creek Parkway Fort Worth, TX 76179 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALBONI, John A. Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | 02 /
CHABOT, Raymond Leo Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Karolinen Karree Karlstraße 12 80333 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23220656.5 | 16.12.2019 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | US201816223558 | 18.12.2018 Original published format: US201816223558 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4325544 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4325544 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/50, H01J29/04, H01J29/96 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H01J29/04 (EP,US);
H01J29/98 (US);
H01J29/96 (EP);
H01J31/50 (EP,US);
H01J31/502 (EP);
H01J31/507 (EP);
H01J2231/50063 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/08] | H01J29/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/43] |
Former [2024/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNG FÜR EINEN BILDVERSTÄRKER EINER NACHTSICHTVORRICHTUNG | [2024/08] | English: | POWER SUPPLY FOR AN IMAGE INTENSIFIER OF A NIGHT VISION EQUIPMENT | [2024/08] | French: | ALIMENTATION POUR INTENSIFICATEUR D'IMAGE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE VISION NOCTURNE | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19897693.8 / EP3900005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1139382 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US2012194079 (CLAUBERG BERND [US], et al); |