EP4324745 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRIC VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.10.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Archer Aviation, Inc. 190 W. Tasman Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWER, Geoffrey, C. San Jose, 95134 / US | 02 /
XUE, Nansi San Jose, 95134 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Alan San Jose, 95134 / US | 04 /
GOLDMAN, Benjamin San Jose, 95134 / US | 05 /
DEPENBUSCH, Nathan San Jose, 95134 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23220866.0 | 24.01.2022 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | US202117157580 | 25.01.2021 Original published format: US202117157580 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4324745 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4324745 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B64C29/00, B64C11/50, B64C11/46, B64C11/30, B64D27/24, B64D27/357, B64D31/16 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B64D27/357 (EP,CN,KR);
B64D31/16 (EP,CN,KR);
B64D31/02 (US);
B60L50/60 (KR,US);
B60L58/12 (KR,US);
B60L58/18 (KR);
B64C11/46 (EP,KR);
B64C27/28 (CN);
B64C27/57 (US);
B64C27/59 (US);
B64C29/0033 (EP,KR,US);
B64D27/24 (US);
B64D27/34 (CN,KR);
B64D31/14 (US);
G05D1/49 (EP);
G05D1/645 (EP);
B60L2200/10 (KR,US);
B64C11/30 (EP);
B64C2220/00 (EP,KR);
G05D2105/24 (EP);
G05D2109/24 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/08] | B64D27/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/45] |
Former [2024/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN VERTIKAL STARTENDEN UND LANDENDEN FLUGZEUGS | [2024/08] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRIC VERTICAL TAKE-OFF AND LANDING AIRCRAFT | [2024/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE D'UN AVION ÉLECTRIQUE À DÉCOLLAGE ET ATTERRISSAGE VERTICAUX | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/45] | 26.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP22703539.1 / EP4281365 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9411329 (GREENE DANIEL H [US], et al); | [Y]EP3401216 (AURORA FLIGHT SCIENCES CORP [US]); | [XYI]EP3657468 (ZUNUM AERO INC [US]); | [XYI]US2020307390 (CLARK KYLE B [US], et al) |