EP4299320 - CLEANING PROCEDURE FOR ANILOX BY OVERLAYING LASER SPOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEG TECHNOLOGIES RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, S.L. Riu Güell, 34 17180 Vilablareix / ES | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guixeras Nogué, Lluis 17180 Vilablareix / ES | 02 /
Guixeras Llora, Rafael 17180 Liablareix / ES | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Torras Toll, Jorge, et al Marqués de Campo Sagrado 8 Ático 2 08015 Barcelona / ES | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23382505.8 | 30.05.2023 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | ES20220030556 | 22.06.2022 Original published format: ES 202230556 | [2024/01] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4299320 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4299320 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4299320 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/04 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
B41F35/04 (EP,ES);
B08B7/0042 (EP,US);
B23K26/0622 (US);
B23K26/073 (US);
B23K26/0884 (US);
B23K26/352 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2024/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ANILOX DURCH ÜBERLAGERUNG VON LASERPUNKTEN | [2024/01] | English: | CLEANING PROCEDURE FOR ANILOX BY OVERLAYING LASER SPOTS | [2024/01] | French: | PROCÉDURE DE NETTOYAGE DE L'ANILOX PAR SUPERPOSITION DE SPOTS LASER | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 04.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2760403 (LASERALP IND [FR]); | [XA]JP2011062650 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [XA]CN112676267 (INST SEMICONDUCTORS CAS) |