EP4265088 - SOIL WORKING DEVICE FOR AGRICULTURAL PURPOSES AND METHOD FOR AGRICULTURAL SOIL WORKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer SE & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mahler, Tom 04249 Leipzig / DE | 02 /
Hinners, Patrick 49078 Osnabrück / DE | 03 /
Lenz, Tino 04275 Leipzig / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 23401012.2 | 03.04.2023 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | DE202210108719 | 11.04.2022 Original published format: DE102022108719 | [2023/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265088 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01B39/18 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A01B39/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE ZWECKE UND VERFAHREN ZUR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN BODENBEARBEITUNG | [2023/43] | English: | SOIL WORKING DEVICE FOR AGRICULTURAL PURPOSES AND METHOD FOR AGRICULTURAL SOIL WORKING | [2023/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAVAIL DU SOL À USAGE AGRICOLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAVAIL DU SOL AGRICOLE | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/39] | 23.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19843677 (MUELLER JOACHIM [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007]; figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE60105324T (MACHF STEKETEE B V [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]EP3387890 (HORSCH MASCHINEN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0093]; figures 1a-1d *; | [X]EP3977837 (HORSCH LEEB APPLICATION SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] - [0015] - [0 26] , [0 33] - [0036] - [0038] - [0045] - [0051] - [0056] - [0089] , [0093] - [0095]; figures 1A-3; claims 1-20 * |