EP4255170 - FLUID DISTRIBUTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENNER, Thomas 89079 Ulm / DE | [2023/43] |
Former [2023/41] | 01 /
Renner, Thomas 89079 Ulm / DE | Representative(s) | Finkele, Rolf, et al Gardena Manufacturing GmbH Hans-Lorenser-Straße 40 89079 Ulm / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23701808.0 | 30.01.2023 | [2023/41] | WO2023EP52201 | Priority number, date | EP20220158691 | 25.02.2022 Original published format: EP 22158691 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023160957 | Date: | 31.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255170 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4255170 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01G25/02, A01G25/16, E03C1/02 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
A01G25/02 (EP);
F16L41/02 (CN);
E03C1/023 (EP,US);
A01G25/16 (EP,US);
F16K11/22 (CN);
F16L41/03 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | A01G25/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDVERTEILER | [2023/41] | English: | FLUID DISTRIBUTOR | [2023/41] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE FLUIDE | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 26.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004005628 (ARICHELL TECH INC [US], et al); | [AD]US7337982 (SPEVAK RANDY [US], et al); | [AD]EP2100669 (MELNOR INC [US]); | [A]US2014263734 (KIM EUGENE EZEKIEL [US]) | by applicant | US7337982 | EP2100669 | US10781578 |